U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10382-t7
  • Case Name: Everett H Garcia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Pro Se Party Electronic Notice and Service Consent Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order on Application)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Terminate Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Receipt of Installment Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Self-Represented Debtor Information Packet]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Add Party]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.