U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10379-j7
  • Case Name: Serafin J Aragon and Nadine V Aragon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Schedules A/B-J, Summaries]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Notice of Error]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Deficiency Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 / Exemption Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Terminate Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Waived (Application to Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Generic Document]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.