U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00226
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Gallagher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.