U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10391-j7
  • Case Name: Christopher Willbart Kloppenburg and Betty Loraine Kloppenburg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Update 28 USC Section 589b stats]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 / Exemption Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Schedules, Summaries & Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Set Deficiency Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [none]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Signature Page]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.