U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01012-j
  • Case Name: Mazel v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Generic Document]
  • April 08, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Defer Filing Fee (Order on Trustee's Application)]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Defer Filing Fee (Trustee's Application only)]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.