U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10210-t7
  • Case Name: Frank Steven Padilla
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Possible Dividend (Notice)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Report of Assets]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report - 341 Concluded]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Amendment to Bankruptcy Schedules (Notice)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Schedules, Summaries & Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (341 filings)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.