U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10396-j7
  • Case Name: Angela Cecilia Archibeque
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Change to Meeting of Creditors - Ch 7/11 (Notice)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [none]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Signature Page]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.