U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10401-t13
  • Case Name: Roberta Carole Hewes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Affidavit/Declaration]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Schedules, Summaries & Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Response]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Notice of Error]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Extend/ShortenTime (Motion)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.