U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10410-t7
  • Case Name: Oscar Villela Campos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Signature Page]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [none]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.