U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10413-t7
  • Case Name: Christopher James Winstead and Audra Nicole Winstead
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [none]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Signature Page]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.