U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10412-t7
  • Case Name: Dylan Austin Pena
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Amendment to Bankruptcy Schedules (Notice)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Additional Parties of Bankruptcy Case Filing (Notice)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Amended Schedules]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [none]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Signature Page]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.