U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valenzuela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extend (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.