U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00716-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doctor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA Appointment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.