U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Murphy et al v. Chavez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.