U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10437-j13
  • Case Name: Christina Danielle Roberts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Receipt of Installment Payment]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order on Application)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Self-Represented Debtor Information Packet]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.