U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10440-j13
  • Case Name: John F. Dewey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Rescheduling Hearing (Order)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Assume Contract/Lease CM06 (Utility)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Valuation (BIF) (Motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Avoid Lien (AV) (Motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.