U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10445-j13
  • Case Name: Fernando Mercado Pena and Luz M Soto de Pena
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Rescheduling Hearing (Order)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Affidavit/Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Valuation (BIF) (Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Avoid Lien (AV) (Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.