U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10458-j13
  • Case Name: Amber Saenz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Rescheduling Hearing (Order)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Affidavit/Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Notice of Error]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Deadline to File Objs to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (Notice)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [ Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information on Requestor]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Signature Page]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cornejo, Tiffany M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.