U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10468-t7
  • Case Name: Juan Manuel Martinez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Notice of Error]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Signature Page]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [none]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.