U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00798-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holguin et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Bond for Witness]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA Appointment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.