U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-01487-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Myers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [CJA Appointment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.