U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10480-t7
  • Case Name: Rolando Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Notice of Error]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Appear pro hac vice (Order)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Deficient Filing (Notice)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Set Judge Code Flag]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Appear pro hac vice (Motion)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Signature Page]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [none]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.