Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:15-35978-cgm
    Party Name:Gerard Anthony DePaoli
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tulis, Mark S. [~SPECIAL~Amended Discharge of Debtor and Order of Final Decree (BNC)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tulis, Mark S. [Certificate of Mailing - Order of Disch. and Final Dec.]
    Date Published:September 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tulis, Mark S. [Financial Management Course Certification (Official Form 23)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tulis, Mark S. [Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting]
    Date Published:May 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto - docket of credit card]
    Date Published:May 28, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.nysb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?258471
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =