open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:04-cv-02390
    Party Name:Village of Pawling v. Amerada Hess Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?246323
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =