Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:16-cv-06528
    Party Name:Nayak v. Jefferies Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counter Statement to Rule 56.1]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 56.1 Statement]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Endorsed Letter]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:October 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Withdrawing Case from Mediation]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?461738
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =