open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:7:18-cv-03846
    Party Name:Igoe v. Town of Red Hook et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediator Session Held]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mediator Session Scheduled]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Mediator Assignment]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Selection for Mediation]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Section 1983 Plan 100-Day Review]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?492934
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =