open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:18-cv-11147
    Party Name:Mendoza et al v. Cavallo's of Chelsea, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Other]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Default Judgment]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Damages]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affirmation in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?505594
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =