open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-04406
    Party Name:Forsee et al v. Metropolitan Transportation Authority et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaints]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:November 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conference]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Local Rule 37.2 Conference]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Adjourn Conference]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Relatedness]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?515606
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =