open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02870-ERK-SMG
    Party Name:Truckenbrodt v. The CBE Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order(Other)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Conference Hearing]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?433304
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =