open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-04656-AMD-SJB
    Party Name:Johnston v. Bank Of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order(Other)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?437386
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =