open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:7:19-cv-07743
    Party Name:El Rashidi El Mizan Confectionery v. Wakefern Food Corp. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Conference]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conference]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Note Regarding Stricken Document]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case Opened]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Note to Out of State Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice - Transfer Case]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order(Other)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out - District Transfer]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?437385
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =