open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-07582
    Party Name:Vanderwerff v. Quincy Bioscience Holding Company, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Endorsed Letter]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Conference]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conference]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Note to Out of State Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?521030
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =