open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-05094-FB-RML
    Party Name:Mtivity Inc. v. Office Depot, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Parties]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Amend ]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pre Motion Conference]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438480
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =