open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00605-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ceranic
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Interest of Justice]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Endorsed Letter]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?521791
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =