open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-06684-WFK-LB
    Party Name:McCarthy v. Starbuck's
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442177
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =