open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:2:19-cv-06661-AMD-LB
    Party Name:Rudolph v. The Department of Justice
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order(Other)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442181
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =