open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-11229
    Party Name:Calcano v. Stance, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Adjourn Conference]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Conference]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527949
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =