open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-11228
    Party Name:Calcano v. Vineyard Vines, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527948
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =