open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-11227
    Party Name:Calcano v. Canada Goose US, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Complaints]
    Date Published:December 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527947
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =