open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-06886-EK-LB
    Party Name:Flores v. Lunas Restaurant Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit/Affirmation]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Statement]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct/Supplement]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:April 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Certificate of Default]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order(Other)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?442428
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =