open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-11239
    Party Name:Guastella v. Long Island Railroad Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Local Rule 37.2 Conference]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?527959
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =