open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00809-AMD-PK
    Party Name:Adams v. Pure Restaurant Corp. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Parties]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pre Motion Conference]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?445076
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =