open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00109-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gamoneda
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Letter Motion]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter Motion]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Interest of Justice]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Unseal Indictment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?531574
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =