open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00805-RRM
    Party Name:Chen et al v. Cuccinelli
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?445072
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =