open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00128-1
    Party Name:USA v. Halchias
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Submission]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to File Information]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?532132
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =