open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:2:17-cr-00479-JS
    Party Name:USA v. Drewery
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Summons]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?406395
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =