open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1:20-cv-03577-MKB-RER
    Party Name:Suris v. Clear Rear LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice of Rule 73]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nyed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?451325
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =