U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1-25-10410-
  • Case Name: Christopher K. Syracuse
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Dismiss Case]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Hearing Held (BK Other)]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Dismiss Case for Other]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Hearing Set (BK Motion)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Dismiss Case for Failure to Prosecute]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Show Cause - Fatal Defect]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Meeting of Creditors Notice (Ch 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Deficiency - Case Opening (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Deficiency - Case Opening (Missing Schedules)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Ch. 13 Case Management Order]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Philippi, Julie [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.