U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Interest of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.