U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALLACE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Transcript]
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Note Regarding Deleted Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.